Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting Licenses - Fox Hunting and Chasing
Sponsored by
Senators Astle, Edwards, Hershey, and Norman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "hunt" as it applies to the laws governing hunting and wildlife in the State to include the act of chasing or in any manner pursuing fox, whether armed or unarmed; repealing a provision of law excluding the sport of fox chasing from the definition of "hunt"; and repealing the exemption for an unarmed person participating in an organized fox hunt from the requirement under specified circumstances to obtain a hunting license.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1629
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - Hunting Licenses - Fox Hunting and Chasing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Natural Resources - Hunting Licenses - Fox Hunting and Chasing
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 10-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM