Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Rapid Health Impact Assessment Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an applicant for a certificate of public convenience and necessity for certain construction to conduct a rapid health impact assessment (HIA) on the project and report on its findings; requiring a rapid HIA report to be completed within 3 weeks after the applicant submits its application to the Commission; requiring an applicant to complete the rapid HIA in a certain manner; requiring the rapid HIA report to be considered part of a certain application; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1632
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Rapid Health Impact Assessment Requirement
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM