Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Recreational Facilities
Sponsored by
Senator Oaks
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the proceeds of table games paid to Baltimore City to be used for recreational facilities may be used only to supplement and not supplant existing expenses or obligations related to recreational facilities.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1138
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Recreational Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Recreational Facilities
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM