Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Determination of Eligibility for Services - Office of the Public Defender
Sponsored by
Senators Zirkin and Miller
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a commissioner to determine the indigence of a specified individual at a specified proceeding under specified circumstances; and providing a presumption that an individual qualified as indigent by a commissioner at an initial appearance qualifies for the service of the Office of the Public Defender.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {828978/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Hearing 4/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2016 3/07/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {828978/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 67
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Hearing 4/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM