Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund to provide grants to eligible counties to establish pretrial services programs; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Fund; requiring certain distributions from the Fund to be used to supplement and not supplant certain other funds; establishing the requirements for a certain pretrial services program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0447
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {158771/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-5)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {158771/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Text - Third - Pretrial Services Program Grant Fund - Establishment
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (36-5) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 68
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-801 through 4-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM