Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Morgan State University - Office of Technology Transfer
Sponsored by
Senators McFadden and Conway
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 713
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Regents of Morgan State University to develop and implement a plan to enhance the Office of Technology Transfer at the University; requiring the Maryland Technology Development Corporation, at the request of the Board of Regents, to provide technical assistance to the Office of Technology Transfer; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $1,000,000 to the University for each of fiscal years 2018 through 2020 for specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1642
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {344433/1
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {344433/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-8)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-27)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 713
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2016 3/07/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments {344433/1 48A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 48A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Favorable with Amendments {344433/1 Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Third Reading Passed (37-8) 50
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/29/2016 3/29/2016 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/30/2016 3/30/2016 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (108-27) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 713
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-104.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM