Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Membership
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Astle, Bates, Cassilly, DeGrange, Eckardt, Hershey, Manno, Norman, Rosapepe, Serafini, Simonaire, Waugh, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Maryland Transportation Authority to include specified members of the General Assembly as nonvoting members of the Authority serving in an advisory capacity only; specifying criteria concerning the appointment, tenure, and compensation of the legislative members of the Authority; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0654 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority - Membership
Senate 3/16/2017 3/17/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM