Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Hours of Operation - Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Conway, McFadden, Ferguson, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a state grant be made available to fund the increased operating expenses for the branches of the Enoch Pratt Free Library that increase their operating hours above the hours in effect as of January 1, 2016; requiring the Governor to include in the State operating budget $3,000,000 to support specified additional operating expenses of the Enoch Pratt Free Library branches in fiscal years 2018 through 2022; stating the intent of the General Assembly regarding increased hours in poor and underserved communities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1401
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {349432/1
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {349432/1
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {349432/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {993224/1 Rejected (14-31)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-12)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-45)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Pugh) Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator Pugh) Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Referred Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {349432/1 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {349432/1 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {349432/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {993224/1 Rejected (14-31) 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (33-12) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (88-45) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM