Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public School Construction Assessment and Maintenance Reform Act
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction to develop and adopt certain educational facilities sufficiency standards, to create the Maryland School Facility Condition Index, and to conduct a statewide facility assessment on or before January 1, 2020, and annually thereafter; requiring the Interagency Committee to establish rankings based on certain criteria; requiring certain conditions for the statewide facility assessment; requiring the Interagency Committee to compare certain data; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1495
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public School Construction Assessment and Maintenance Reform Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public School Construction Assessment and Maintenance Reform Act
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-302.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM