Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foreclosed and Vacant Residential Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Regular Assessments
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, with regard to a residential property in a common ownership community that is in foreclosure and vacant, the secured party that files the action to foreclose on the residential property to pay specified regular assessments for common expenses starting 30 days after the action to foreclose is filed and until the property title is recorded by the new owner after the foreclosure sale; and making a secured party that fails to pay regular assessments under the Act subject to a fine of $500 per month of nonpayment.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1437
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Muse) Adopted 40
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Muse) Adopted 40
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 40
Text - First - Foreclosed and Vacant Residential Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Regular Assessments
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.1, 7-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM