Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - New Residential Construction - Correction of Drainage Defect
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified home builder to correct a specified drainage defect within 30 days after receiving written notice of the defect if a specified owner provides notice, including specified documentation, to the home builder within 1 year after the day the owner takes possession or the day the home builder completes specified grading or landscaping work.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1413
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Muse) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Muse) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - First - Real Property - New Residential Construction - Correction of Drainage Defect
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-711 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page