Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks
Sponsored by
Senators Manno and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Center for School Safety to make grants for specified security-related projects to schools and child care centers determined to be at risk of specified hate crimes or attacks; authorizing specified schools or child care centers to apply to the Center for a specified State grant; establishing the terms and conditions for the use of specified State grant funds by specified recipients; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1661
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Manno) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {344233/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Manno) Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Senate Rules 44
Text - First - Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks
Senate 3/16/2017 3/17/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments {344233/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Text - Third - Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 56
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 67
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Text - Chapter - Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or Attacks
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-305 )
(   7-1502.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM