Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcome Partnership Fund
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Mathias, Middleton, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "eligible functions" to allow funds from the Substance Abuse Treatment Outcome Partnership Fund to be used for recovery support systems; altering the definition of "eligible population" to allow funds from the Fund to be used for services provided to individuals in recovery; requiring, beginning in fiscal year 2019, and subject to the limitations of the State budget, the Governor to annually include $8,400,000 in the State budget for the Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcome Partnership Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {447175/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcome Partnership Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Senate Rules 45
Text - First - Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcome Partnership Fund
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments {447175/1 Adopted 57
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Public Health - Substance Abuse Treatment Outcome Partnership Fund
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 63
House 4/06/2017 4/07/2017 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-6C-01, 8-6C-02 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM