Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Senators
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, for specified fiscal years, the Governor to include in the budget bill an appropriation for specified purposes related to the new Prince George's County Regional Medical Center; requiring, for specified fiscal years, the Governor to include in the capital or operating budget bill specified amounts to be used for the construction of the Prince George's County Regional Medical Center; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-11)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-44)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Peters) Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Referred Senate Rules 49
Text - First - Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2017
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51
Text - Third - Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2017
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (34-11) 52
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 3/28/2017 3/28/2017 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/28/2017 3/28/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/28/2017 3/28/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (90-44) 59
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Returned Passed 55
Post Passage 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2017
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM