Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Partial Disability - Concurrent Employment
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a covered employee, during the time the employee is receiving temporary partial disability benefits as a result of an accidental personal injury or occupational disease, to earn wages, under certain circumstances, from concurrent employment in which the covered employee was engaged at the time that the accidental personal injury or occupational disease occurred; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Temporary Partial Disability - Concurrent Employment
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM