Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Education Aid - Mandated Educational Requirements - County Board Opt-Out
Sponsored by
Senator Ready
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that if less than 45% of a county board's 3-year moving average annual budget is funded by the State, the county board may, in the following school year, opt out of certain mandated educational requirements; requiring certain county boards to follow federally mandated education requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - State Education Aid - Mandated Educational Requirements - County Board Opt-Out
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM