Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements - Credit Transfer
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a grantor of certain preservation and conservation easements to transfer a tax credit allowed against the State income tax for the conveyance of the easements under certain circumstances; requiring the Maryland Environmental Trust to issue certain tax credit certificates; authorizing the holder of the certificate to transfer the certificate; authorizing the Comptroller to assess a certain fee on the transferee of a certificate; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements - Credit Transfer
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-723 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM