Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Threat of Mass Violence
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a certain prohibition relating to threatening to commit a certain crime of violence so as to prohibit a person from knowingly threatening to commit or threatening to cause to be committed a certain crime of violence that would place five or more minors at substantial risk of death or serious physical injury if the threat were carried out.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1807
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {298279/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Threat of Mass Violence
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence and Deadly Weapons on Public School Property
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {298279/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Threat of Mass Violence
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/30/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1001 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM