Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employees' and Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment Earnings Limitation
Sponsored by
Senators Peters and Jennings
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Correcting certain requirements pertaining to a certain earnings limitation to certain retirees of the Employees' and Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems; exempting certain retirees from a certain earnings limitation under certain circumstances; requiring certain participating employers to pay a certain offset under certain circumstances; providing that certain retirees are entitled to certain reimbursement for a certain reemployment earnings offset under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Employees' and Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment Earnings Limitation
Senate 3/08/2018 3/09/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Adopted 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed 48A
Text - Third - Employees' and Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment Earnings Limitation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Appropriations 50
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Text - Chapter - Employees' and Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment Earnings Limitation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM