Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Extending the Lewis and Clark National Historic Trail
Sponsored by
Senator Madaleno
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Urging the National Park Service in the U.S. Department of the Interior to expeditiously complete and provide to Congress the Eastern Legacy Special Resource Study and include within the Study a recommendation that the Lewis and Clark National Historic Trail be extended to the East; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Reassigned to House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed 39
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 43
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Reassigned to House Rules and Executive Nominations 45
House 3/31/2016 3/31/2016 Hearing 4/01 at 3:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM