Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 4
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expressing the opposition of the General Assembly to the drastic cuts to the funding of the Chesapeake Bay Program and specified other programs proposed by the President of the United States in the federal budget blueprint for fiscal year 2018; urging the Governor to publicly oppose the cuts proposed by the President to the funding of specified programs; and requiring specified committees of the General Assembly to monitor and make recommendations regarding federal budget proposals and actions affecting the Chesapeake Bay.
Details
Cross-filed with: HJ0010
Bill File Type: Regular
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-10)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-10)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 4
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/21/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (35-10) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Hearing 4/08 at 9:30 a.m.
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Hearing canceled
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Hearing 4/08 at 10:00 a.m.
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (107-10) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 4
Text - Chapter - Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission Request
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page