Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Attorney General, Office Of The

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535 /CH0721 (SB0734/CH0722)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Structured Settlements - Transfers and Registration of Structured Settlement Transferees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159 (SB0773)
Title
Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - Restrictions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314 (SB0772)
Title
Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1491 (SB0771/CH0579)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Restrictions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0734 /CH0722 (HB0535/CH0721)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Structured Settlements - Transfers and Registration of Structured Settlement Transferees
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 /CH0579 (HB1491)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Restrictions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772 (HB1314)
Title
Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773 (HB1159)
Title
Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - Restrictions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0535 /CH0721 (SB0734/CH0722) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Structured Settlements - Transfers and Registration of Structured Settlement Transferees By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721
Judiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1159 (SB0773) Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - Restrictions By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1314 (SB0772) Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1491 (SB0771/CH0579) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Restrictions By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0734 /CH0722 (HB0535/CH0721) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Structured Settlements - Transfers and Registration of Structured Settlement Transferees By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 722
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0771 /CH0579 (HB1491) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - Restrictions By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 579
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0772 (HB1314) Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0773 (HB1159) Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - Restrictions By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM