Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Baltimore City Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0311 (SB0265)
Title
Gang-Related Crimes - Reporting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 (SB0264)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - Prohibition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0313 /CH0594 (SB0266)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Baltimore City - Warrants
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0314 /CH0479 (SB0267/CH0478)
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Newly Constructed Dwellings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0315 /CH0096 (SB0396)
Title
Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or Guardianship
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354 /CH0396 (SB0263)
Title
Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386 (SB0390/CH0493)
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876 /CH0194 (SB0736/CH0193)
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Historic or Heritage Properties - Calculation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1351 /CH0453
Title
Baltimore City - Special Police Officers and School Police Officers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263 (HB0354/CH0396)
Title
Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264 (HB0312)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - Prohibition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 (HB0311)
Title
Gang-Related Crimes - Reporting
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 (HB0313/CH0594)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Baltimore City - Warrants
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0267 /CH0478 (HB0314/CH0479)
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Newly Constructed Dwellings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0390 /CH0493 (HB0386)
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0396 (HB0315/CH0096)
Title
Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or Guardianship
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0736 /CH0193 (HB0876/CH0194)
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Historic or Heritage Properties - Calculation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0311 (SB0265) Gang-Related Crimes - Reporting By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0312 (SB0264) Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - Prohibition By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0313 /CH0594 (SB0266) Maryland Income Tax Refund - Baltimore City - Warrants By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Ways and Means
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0314 /CH0479 (SB0267/CH0478) Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Newly Constructed Dwellings By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Ways and Means
2/06/2014 - 2:15 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 PM
HB0315 /CH0096 (SB0396) Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or Guardianship By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Judiciary
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0354 /CH0396 (SB0263) Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0386 (SB0390/CH0493) Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0876 /CH0194 (SB0736/CH0193) Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Historic or Heritage Properties - Calculation By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 PM
HB1351 /CH0453 Baltimore City - Special Police Officers and School Police Officers By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0263 (HB0354/CH0396) Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0264 (HB0312) Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - Prohibition By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0265 (HB0311) Gang-Related Crimes - Reporting By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0266 (HB0313/CH0594) Maryland Income Tax Refund - Baltimore City - Warrants By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Ways and Means
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0267 /CH0478 (HB0314/CH0479) Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Newly Constructed Dwellings By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0390 /CH0493 (HB0386) Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0396 (HB0315/CH0096) Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or Guardianship By Request - Committee 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0736 /CH0193 (HB0876/CH0194) Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Historic or Heritage Properties - Calculation By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM