Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Baltimore City Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0311 (SB0400/CH0851)
Title
Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve Fund
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0788 /CH0227 (SB0676/CH0226)
Title
Baltimore City - Community Benefits Districts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 (SB0841)
Title
Pimlico Community Development Authority – Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 (SB1062)
Title
Weapon Crimes – Detachable Magazines and Regulated Firearms – Possession
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385 /CH0641 (SB1085/CH0642)
Title
Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1508
Title
Baltimore City - Children - Records Access
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1548 /CH0639 (SB1084/CH0640)
Title
Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1553 /CH0637 (SB0826/CH0638)
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful Evictions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1740 (SB1179)
Title
Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0400 /CH0851 (HB0311)
Title
Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve Fund
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 /CH0226 (HB0788/CH0227)
Title
Baltimore City - Community Benefits Districts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0826 /CH0638 (HB1553/CH0637)
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful Evictions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0841 (HB0796)
Title
Pimlico Community Development Authority – Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1062 (HB0991)
Title
Weapon Crimes - Detachable Magazines and Regulated Firearms - Possession
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1084 /CH0640 (HB1548/CH0639)
Title
Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1085 /CH0642 (HB1385/CH0641)
Title
Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1179 (HB1740)
Title
Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0311 (SB0400/CH0851) Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve Fund By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0788 /CH0227 (SB0676/CH0226) Baltimore City - Community Benefits Districts By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0796 (SB0841) Pimlico Community Development Authority – Membership By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0991 (SB1062) Weapon Crimes – Detachable Magazines and Regulated Firearms – Possession By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 /CH0641 (SB1085/CH0642) Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1508 Baltimore City - Children - Records Access By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1548 /CH0639 (SB1084/CH0640) Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1553 /CH0637 (SB0826/CH0638) Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful Evictions By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 637
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1740 (SB1179) Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0400 /CH0851 (HB0311) Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits and Capital Improvement Reserve Fund By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 851
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0676 /CH0226 (HB0788/CH0227) Baltimore City - Community Benefits Districts By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0826 /CH0638 (HB1553/CH0637) Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful Evictions By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0841 (HB0796) Pimlico Community Development Authority – Membership By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Finance
SB1062 (HB0991) Weapon Crimes - Detachable Magazines and Regulated Firearms - Possession By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1084 /CH0640 (HB1548/CH0639) Baltimore City - Continuing the Creating Opportunities for Renewal and Enterprise (CORE) Partnership Fund By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1085 /CH0642 (HB1385/CH0641) Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Finance
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1179 (HB1740) Baltimore City - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM