Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Baltimore County Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0183 (SB0330/CH0159)
Title
Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws - 2015 Edition - Legalization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 (SB0329)
Title
Baltimore County - Civil Actions - Subpoena for Police Officer - Liability of Party for Reimbursement of Cost
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0329 (HB0892)
Title
Baltimore County - Civil Actions - Subpoena for Police Officer - Liability of Party for Reimbursement of Cost
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0330 /CH0159 (HB0183)
Title
Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws - 2015 Edition - Legalization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0183 (SB0330/CH0159) Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws - 2015 Edition - Legalization By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0892 (SB0329) Baltimore County - Civil Actions - Subpoena for Police Officer - Liability of Party for Reimbursement of Cost By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0329 (HB0892) Baltimore County - Civil Actions - Subpoena for Police Officer - Liability of Party for Reimbursement of Cost By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0330 /CH0159 (HB0183) Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws - 2015 Edition - Legalization By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM