Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Assessments And Taxation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465 /CH0268
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Distribution of Recordation and Transfer Tax Revenues
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026 /CH0266
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Expedited Document Processing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 /CH0267
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Notices and Orders - E-Mail
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0165 Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
HB0465 /CH0268 State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Distribution of Recordation and Transfer Tax Revenues By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0026 /CH0266 State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Expedited Document Processing By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0059 /CH0267 State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Notices and Orders - E-Mail By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Budget and Taxation
1/17/2019 - 10:30 AM
Ways and Means
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM