Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Environment, Department Of The

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0095 /CH0608
Title
Environment - Permits - New Source Performance Standards
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0096 /CH0080
Title
Natural Resources - Restricted Shellfish Harvest Areas - Water Testing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 /CH0081
Title
Environment - Sediment Control and Stormwater Management Plans - Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1440 /CH0686
Title
Recycling - Composting Facilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0012
Title
Environment - Public Hearings - Notice Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0095 /CH0608 Environment - Permits - New Source Performance Standards By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0096 /CH0080 Natural Resources - Restricted Shellfish Harvest Areas - Water Testing By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0097 /CH0081 Environment - Sediment Control and Stormwater Management Plans - Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1440 /CH0686 Recycling - Composting Facilities By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 686
Environmental Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0061 /CH0012 Environment - Public Hearings - Notice Requirement By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM