Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

General Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0014
Title
Small Business Reserve Program - Procurements by Designated Procurement Units
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0207 /CH0589
Title
State Capital Projects - High Performance Buildings - Maryland Green Building Council
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0629 /CH0604
Title
Environmentally Preferable Procurement - Maryland Green Purchasing Committee
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1488
Title
State Procurement - Source Selection and Protest Appeals Procedures - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0014 Small Business Reserve Program - Procurements by Designated Procurement Units By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0207 /CH0589 State Capital Projects - High Performance Buildings - Maryland Green Building Council By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0629 /CH0604 Environmentally Preferable Procurement - Maryland Green Purchasing Committee By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1488 State Procurement - Source Selection and Protest Appeals Procedures - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM