Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Housing And Community Development, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0451 /CH0228
Title
Neighborhood Business Development Program - Financial Assistance for Food Deserts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0453 /CH0229
Title
Housing and Community Development - Multifamily Rental Housing Programs Efficiency Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553 /CH0410
Title
Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0451 /CH0228 Neighborhood Business Development Program - Financial Assistance for Food Deserts By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0453 /CH0229 Housing and Community Development - Multifamily Rental Housing Programs Efficiency Act By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0553 /CH0410 Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM