Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health And Mental Hygiene, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220 /CH0136
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0089
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provision of Substance Use Services to Enrollees of Managed Care Organizations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 /CH0046
Title
Public Health - State-Identified HIV Priorities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097 /CH0348 (HB0468)
Title
Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 /CH0048
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - Required
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114
Title
Health - Prohibition on Distribution of Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices to Minors - Civil Enforcement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1220 /CH0136 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0089 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provision of Substance Use Services to Enrollees of Managed Care Organizations By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0091 /CH0046 Public Health - State-Identified HIV Priorities By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Finance
1/20/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0097 /CH0348 (HB0468) Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach Programs By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0109 /CH0048 Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - Required By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0114 Health - Prohibition on Distribution of Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices to Minors - Civil Enforcement By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM