Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Health, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0168 /CH0103
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Inactive Status of Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0248
Title
Health Occupations - Certified Associate Counselors-Alcohol and Drug and Certified Supervised Counselors-Alcohol and Drug - Qualifications
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0384
Title
Substance Use Facilities and Programs - Certificate of Need - Repeal of Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385
Title
Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1726
Title
Maryland Dentistry Act - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1792
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Deputy Secretary for Operations and Director of the Behavioral Health Administration - Repeal of Positions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0008 /CH0656
Title
State Board of Nursing - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0017 /CH0657
Title
Health Information Exchanges - Definitions and Regulations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058 /CH0411
Title
State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 /CH0658
Title
Maryland Chiropractic Act - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 /CH0659
Title
State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice - Licensure - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 /CH0212
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Registration, Schedules, Penalties, and Orders of Impoundment
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105 /CH0660
Title
State Advisory Council on Hereditary and Congenital Disorders – Membership and Appointments
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0108 /CH0661
Title
Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - Revisions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0110 /CH0662
Title
State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners – Licensure – Qualifications and Examinations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0111 /CH0663
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Criminal History Records Checks - Contractors With Access to Federal Tax Information
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0166 Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0168 /CH0103 State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Inactive Status of Licenses By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0248 Health Occupations - Certified Associate Counselors-Alcohol and Drug and Certified Supervised Counselors-Alcohol and Drug - Qualifications By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0384 Substance Use Facilities and Programs - Certificate of Need - Repeal of Requirement By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0385 Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1726 Maryland Dentistry Act - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1792 Maryland Department of Health - Deputy Secretary for Operations and Director of the Behavioral Health Administration - Repeal of Positions By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0008 /CH0656 State Board of Nursing - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 656
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0017 /CH0657 Health Information Exchanges - Definitions and Regulations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0058 /CH0411 State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0062 /CH0658 Maryland Chiropractic Act - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 658
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0080 /CH0659 State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice - Licensure - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 659
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0087 /CH0212 Controlled Dangerous Substances - Registration, Schedules, Penalties, and Orders of Impoundment By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0105 /CH0660 State Advisory Council on Hereditary and Congenital Disorders – Membership and Appointments By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 660
Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0108 /CH0661 Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - Revisions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Finance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0110 /CH0662 State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners – Licensure – Qualifications and Examinations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 662
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0111 /CH0663 Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Criminal History Records Checks - Contractors With Access to Federal Tax Information By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 663
Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM