Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Human Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0167
Title
Juvenile Causes - Safe Haven Newborns
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373
Title
Family Law - Paternity and Birth Certificates
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0843 /CH0079
Title
Department of Human Services - Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Information
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0001 /CH0076
Title
Paternity Proceedings - Attorney for the Child Support Administration
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Child Support - Lien Against Monetary Award
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024 /CH0078 (HB1212/CH0077)
Title
Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0167 Juvenile Causes - Safe Haven Newborns By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0373 Family Law - Paternity and Birth Certificates By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0843 /CH0079 Department of Human Services - Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Information By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0001 /CH0076 Paternity Proceedings - Attorney for the Child Support Administration By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0023 Child Support - Lien Against Monetary Award By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0024 /CH0078 (HB1212/CH0077) Family Law - Kinship Caregivers By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2019 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM