Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Insurance Administration, Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 /CH0023
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097 /CH0024
Title
Insurance - Public Adjusters - Prohibited Inducements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 /CH0025
Title
Health Insurance - Medicare Marketing Rules
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099 /CH0026
Title
Insurance - Fraud Violations - Civil and Criminal Actions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0100 /CH0027
Title
Insurance - Premiums and Charges - Review of Administrative Expenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0096 /CH0023 Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0097 /CH0024 Insurance - Public Adjusters - Prohibited Inducements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 24
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0098 /CH0025 Health Insurance - Medicare Marketing Rules By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0099 /CH0026 Insurance - Fraud Violations - Civil and Criminal Actions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0100 /CH0027 Insurance - Premiums and Charges - Review of Administrative Expenses By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM