Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Insurance Administration, Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049
Title
Recoupment of the Health Insurance Provider Fee - Calculation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 /CH0113
Title
Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Mandated Deductible Levels - Limitation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379 /CH0114
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Commercial Policies - Notice and Quotes
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 /CH0100
Title
Insurance Regulation - Third Party Administrators - Life Insurance
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028 /CH0101
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage Requirements for Behavioral Health Disorders - Short-Term Limited Duration Insurance
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029 /CH0102
Title
Insurance - Licensure of Insurance Producers and Public Adjusters - Continuing Education Requirements
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0030 /CH0103
Title
Insurance - Breach of Security of a Computer System - Notification Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031 /CH0104
Title
Insurance - Insurance Holding Company Model Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0044 /CH0105
Title
Insurance - Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Act
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0045 /CH0106
Title
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Authorization to Settle - Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046 /CH0107
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon Lapse - Application
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0047 /CH0108
Title
Health Insurance - Technical Correction and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0048 /CH0109
Title
Health Insurance - Referral to Specialists - Definition of Provider Panel
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0049 /CH0110
Title
Task Force to Study Cooperative Purchasing for Health Insurance - Membership and Staffing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0050 /CH0111
Title
Health Insurance - Form Filings - Review and Waiting Period Extensions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 /CH0112
Title
Insurance - Life Insurance and Annuities - Record Retention
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0049 Recoupment of the Health Insurance Provider Fee - Calculation By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0162 /CH0113 Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Mandated Deductible Levels - Limitation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Economic Matters
1/31/2019 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0379 /CH0114 Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Commercial Policies - Notice and Quotes By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Economic Matters
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0022 /CH0100 Insurance Regulation - Third Party Administrators - Life Insurance By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Finance
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0028 /CH0101 Health Insurance - Coverage Requirements for Behavioral Health Disorders - Short-Term Limited Duration Insurance By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Finance
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0029 /CH0102 Insurance - Licensure of Insurance Producers and Public Adjusters - Continuing Education Requirements By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Finance
1/10/2019 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0030 /CH0103 Insurance - Breach of Security of a Computer System - Notification Requirement By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Finance
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0031 /CH0104 Insurance - Insurance Holding Company Model Act By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Finance
1/29/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0044 /CH0105 Insurance - Corporate Governance Annual Disclosure Act By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Finance
1/29/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0045 /CH0106 Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Authorization to Settle - Clarification By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Finance
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0046 /CH0107 Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon Lapse - Application By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Finance
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0047 /CH0108 Health Insurance - Technical Correction and Required Conformity With Federal Law By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Finance
1/10/2019 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0048 /CH0109 Health Insurance - Referral to Specialists - Definition of Provider Panel By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Finance
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0049 /CH0110 Task Force to Study Cooperative Purchasing for Health Insurance - Membership and Staffing By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Finance
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0050 /CH0111 Health Insurance - Form Filings - Review and Waiting Period Extensions By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Finance
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0073 /CH0112 Insurance - Life Insurance and Annuities - Record Retention By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Finance
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM