Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Labor, Licensing And Regulation, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0005
Title
State Board of Plumbing - Continuing Professional Competency - Master Plumbers and Master Natural Gas Fitters
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0006 /CH0211
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Guaranty Fund - Claims
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013 /CH0081
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Perpetual Care Trust Funds and Preneed Trust Accounts - Regulation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0467 /CH0100
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment of Minors
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1417 /CH0251
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0045
Title
Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046
Title
State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Prohibited Acts - Civil Penalty
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054 /CH0120
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Apprenticeship and Training Council
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130 /CH0038
Title
Commissioner of Labor and Industry and Workers' Compensation Commission - Reports of Accidental Injury or Disability - Electronic Sharing
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0005 State Board of Plumbing - Continuing Professional Competency - Master Plumbers and Master Natural Gas Fitters By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0006 /CH0211 Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Guaranty Fund - Claims By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0013 /CH0081 Office of Cemetery Oversight - Perpetual Care Trust Funds and Preneed Trust Accounts - Regulation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0467 /CH0100 Labor and Employment - Employment of Minors By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Economic Matters
2/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1417 /CH0251 Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Economic Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0045 Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0046 State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Prohibited Acts - Civil Penalty By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0054 /CH0120 Labor and Employment - Maryland Apprenticeship and Training Council By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0130 /CH0038 Commissioner of Labor and Industry and Workers' Compensation Commission - Reports of Accidental Injury or Disability - Electronic Sharing By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Finance
1/09/2014 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM