Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Lottery And Gaming Control Agency

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454 /CH0230
Title
Gaming - Emergency Suspension of License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0460 /CH0231
Title
Gaming - Background Investigations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - Authorized
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 /CH0130
Title
State Lottery - Retailer Licenses - Background Investigations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0108 /CH0131
Title
State Lottery - Unlawful Representation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0454 /CH0230 Gaming - Emergency Suspension of License By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 PM
HB0460 /CH0231 Gaming - Background Investigations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 PM
HB0465 State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - Authorized By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0107 /CH0130 State Lottery - Retailer Licenses - Background Investigations By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0108 /CH0131 State Lottery - Unlawful Representation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM
Click to return on the top page