Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Natural Resources, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706 /CH0384
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 /CH0173
Title
Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0074
Title
Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0706 /CH0384 Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013 By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0059 /CH0173 Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0074 Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM