Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Safety And Correctional Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159 (SB0113)
Title
Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices - Penalty
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0163 (SB0115)
Title
Correctional Services - Minimum Security Inmates - Transfer to Local Correctional Facilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173 (SB0126/CH0139)
Title
Public Safety - Prohibition of Polygraph Examinations by Employers - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174 /CH0217 (SB0114)
Title
Public Safety - Internal Investigative Unit - Name Change and Duties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1457 /CH0257
Title
State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Definition of Correctional Officer
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1458 /CH0252
Title
Correctional Services - Charges Recommending Discipline - Investigative Period
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0113 (HB0159)
Title
Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices - Penalty
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114 (HB0174/CH0217)
Title
Public Safety - Internal Investigative Unit - Name Change and Duties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0115 (HB0163)
Title
Correctional Services - Minimum Security Inmates - Transfer to Local Correctional Facilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0126 /CH0139 (HB0173)
Title
Public Safety - Prohibition of Polygraph Examinations by Employers - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0159 (SB0113) Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices - Penalty By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0163 (SB0115) Correctional Services - Minimum Security Inmates - Transfer to Local Correctional Facilities By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0173 (SB0126/CH0139) Public Safety - Prohibition of Polygraph Examinations by Employers - Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0174 /CH0217 (SB0114) Public Safety - Internal Investigative Unit - Name Change and Duties By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Judiciary
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1457 /CH0257 State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Definition of Correctional Officer By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1458 /CH0252 Correctional Services - Charges Recommending Discipline - Investigative Period By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0113 (HB0159) Criminal Law - Contraband - Telecommunication Devices - Penalty By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/15/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0114 (HB0174/CH0217) Public Safety - Internal Investigative Unit - Name Change and Duties By Request - Departmental 5 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
1/15/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0115 (HB0163) Correctional Services - Minimum Security Inmates - Transfer to Local Correctional Facilities By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0126 /CH0139 (HB0173) Public Safety - Prohibition of Polygraph Examinations by Employers - Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM