Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Transportation, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0119 /CH0003
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission - Establishment and Compact
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149 /CH0112
Title
Transportation - Light Rail and Metro Subway - State Safety Oversight Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713 /CH0718
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Light Rail Vehicles - Exemption
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1017 /CH0717
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0009
Title
Motor Vehicles - Autonomous and Connected Vehicles
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0025 /CH0716
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Service - Contracted Taxicab Service
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 /CH0344
Title
Motor Vehicles - Leased Vehicles - Inspections, Insurance, and Excise Tax
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0045 /CH0195
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0119 /CH0003 Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission - Establishment and Compact By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0149 /CH0112 Transportation - Light Rail and Metro Subway - State Safety Oversight Authority By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0713 /CH0718 Sales and Use Tax - Light Rail Vehicles - Exemption By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 718
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1017 /CH0717 Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 717
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0009 Motor Vehicles - Autonomous and Connected Vehicles By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0025 /CH0716 Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Service - Contracted Taxicab Service By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 716
Finance
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0034 /CH0344 Motor Vehicles - Leased Vehicles - Inspections, Insurance, and Excise Tax By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0045 /CH0195 Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records Checks By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM