Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Transportation, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253 /CH0543
Title
Motor Vehicles - Automobile Transporters
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0038 /CH0526
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration – Birth Certificates – Issuance of Copies
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039 /CH0041
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Disability Parking Placards
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0253 /CH0543 Motor Vehicles - Automobile Transporters By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0038 /CH0526 Motor Vehicle Administration – Birth Certificates – Issuance of Copies By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0039 /CH0041 Motor Vehicle Administration - Disability Parking Placards By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM