Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legislative Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0115 /CH0100 (SB0183/CH0056)
Title
Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116 /CH0066 (SB0189/CH0065)
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Sunset Review - Required Reports and Repeal of Preliminary Evaluation Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0117 /CH0058 (SB0190/CH0057)
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183 /CH0056 (HB0115/CH0100)
Title
Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0189 /CH0065 (HB0116/CH0066)
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Sunset Review - Required Reports and Repeal of Preliminary Evaluation Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0190 /CH0057 (HB0117/CH0058)
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493 /CH0061
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0494 /CH0062
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0115 /CH0100 (SB0183/CH0056) Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Economic Matters
1/25/2017 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0116 /CH0066 (SB0189/CH0065) Maryland Insurance Administration - Sunset Review - Required Reports and Repeal of Preliminary Evaluation Requirement By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Economic Matters
1/25/2017 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0117 /CH0058 (SB0190/CH0057) Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting Requirement By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Economic Matters
1/25/2017 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0183 /CH0056 (HB0115/CH0100) Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0189 /CH0065 (HB0116/CH0066) Maryland Insurance Administration - Sunset Review - Required Reports and Repeal of Preliminary Evaluation Requirement By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0190 /CH0057 (HB0117/CH0058) Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting Requirement By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0493 /CH0061 Annual Curative Bill By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0494 /CH0062 Annual Corrective Bill By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM