Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legislative Services, Department Of - Code Revision

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0196
Title
Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0398 /CH0197
Title
Code Revision - Estates and Trusts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0206 /CH0196 Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0398 /CH0197 Code Revision - Estates and Trusts By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM