Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Frederick County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 /CH0072 (SB0198/CH0071)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Hours of Sale
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0179 /CH0493 (SB0209)
Title
Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Barbershops
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 (SB0326)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0474 (SB0188)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Northwest Trek Conservation and Education Center Phase 2
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0475 (SB0187)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Helen Smith Studio
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645 (SB0518/CH0075)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Events - Sunday Hours of Operation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0646 /CH0074 (SB0453/CH0073)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Restaurants - Average Daily Receipts
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655 (SB0519/CH0494)
Title
Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976 (SB0550)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County Council
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1182 /CH0495 (SB0827)
Title
Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0178 /CH0072 (SB0198/CH0071) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Hours of Sale By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0179 /CH0493 (SB0209) Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Barbershops By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0396 (SB0326) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0474 (SB0188) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Northwest Trek Conservation and Education Center Phase 2 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0475 (SB0187) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Helen Smith Studio By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0645 (SB0518/CH0075) Frederick County - Gaming Events - Sunday Hours of Operation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0646 /CH0074 (SB0453/CH0073) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Restaurants - Average Daily Receipts By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0655 (SB0519/CH0494) Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals By Request - Committee 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0976 (SB0550) Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County Council By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1182 /CH0495 (SB0827) Frederick County - State's Attorney - Annual Salary By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM