Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judicial Conference, Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 (SB0064/CH0468)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Educational Stability
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0038 (SB0061)
Title
Court of Special Appeals - Writs of Actual Innocence, Illegal Sentences, and Coram Nobis Petitions - Review by Application for Leave to Appeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 (SB0069/CH0124)
Title
Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0079 /CH0213 (SB0068)
Title
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0032)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0500
Title
Judgeships - District Court
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0537
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release of Criminal Defendants - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public Defender
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032 (HB0108)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 (HB0038)
Title
Court of Special Appeals - Writs of Actual Innocence, Illegal Sentences, and Coram Nobis Petitions - Review by Application for Leave to Appeal
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 /CH0468 (HB0001)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Educational Stability
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068 (HB0079/CH0213)
Title
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 /CH0124 (HB0045)
Title
Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 (SB0064/CH0468) Children in Need of Assistance - Educational Stability By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0038 (SB0061) Court of Special Appeals - Writs of Actual Innocence, Illegal Sentences, and Coram Nobis Petitions - Review by Application for Leave to Appeal By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0045 (SB0069/CH0124) Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0079 /CH0213 (SB0068) Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Judiciary
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0108 (SB0032) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0500 Judgeships - District Court By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0537 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release of Criminal Defendants - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public Defender By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0032 (HB0108) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0061 (HB0038) Court of Special Appeals - Writs of Actual Innocence, Illegal Sentences, and Coram Nobis Petitions - Review by Application for Leave to Appeal By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0064 /CH0468 (HB0001) Children in Need of Assistance - Educational Stability By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0068 (HB0079/CH0213) Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0069 /CH0124 (HB0045) Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM