Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judicial Conference, Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0476 (SB0746/CH0834)
Title
District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219 /CH0157 (SB0912/CH0156)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Sex Trafficking
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0746 /CH0834 (HB0476)
Title
District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 /CH0156 (HB1219/CH0157)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Sex Trafficking
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0476 (SB0746/CH0834) District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1219 /CH0157 (SB0912/CH0156) Children in Need of Assistance - Sex Trafficking By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0746 /CH0834 (HB0476) District Court Commissioners - Residency in Contiguous County By Request - Other 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0912 /CH0156 (HB1219/CH0157) Children in Need of Assistance - Sex Trafficking By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM