Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Pensions, Joint Committee On

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379 (SB0343/CH0188)
Title
Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Alternate Contributory Pension Selection and Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0380 (SB0344/CH0189)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Local Fire and Police System - Commingling of Assets
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381 (SB0321/CH0064)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - Designee Appointments and Fiduciary Duties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382 (SB0345/CH0190)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Optional Retirement Allowances - Designated Beneficiaries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0537 (SB0373/CH0196)
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 (SB0477/CH0212)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Reemployment of Ordinary Disability Retirees - Earnings Limitation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0582 (SB0473/CH0211)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Clifton T. Perkins Maximum Security Guards - Allowances
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940 (SB0820)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1397 (SB0821/CH0233)
Title
Participating Governmental Units - Amortization Schedule
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0321 /CH0064 (HB0381)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - Designee Appointments and Fiduciary Duties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0343 /CH0188 (HB0379)
Title
Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Alternate Contributory Pension Selection and Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 /CH0189 (HB0380)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Local Fire and Police System - Commingling of Assets
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0345 /CH0190 (HB0382)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Optional Retirement Allowances - Designated Beneficiaries
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0373 /CH0196 (HB0537)
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 /CH0211 (HB0582)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Clifton T. Perkins Maximum Security Guards - Allowances
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0477 /CH0212 (HB0581)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Reemployment of Ordinary Disability Retirees - Earnings Limitation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0820 (HB0940)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement - Alterations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 /CH0233 (HB1397)
Title
Participating Governmental Units - Amortization Schedule
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0379 (SB0343/CH0188) Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Alternate Contributory Pension Selection and Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/02/2016 - 12:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0380 (SB0344/CH0189) State Retirement and Pension System - Local Fire and Police System - Commingling of Assets By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/02/2016 - 12:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0381 (SB0321/CH0064) State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - Designee Appointments and Fiduciary Duties By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/02/2016 - 12:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0382 (SB0345/CH0190) State Retirement and Pension System - Optional Retirement Allowances - Designated Beneficiaries By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0537 (SB0373/CH0196) Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Clarification By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0581 (SB0477/CH0212) State Retirement and Pension System - Reemployment of Ordinary Disability Retirees - Earnings Limitation By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0582 (SB0473/CH0211) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Clifton T. Perkins Maximum Security Guards - Allowances By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0940 (SB0820) State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement - Alterations By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1397 (SB0821/CH0233) Participating Governmental Units - Amortization Schedule By Request - Other 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0321 /CH0064 (HB0381) State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - Designee Appointments and Fiduciary Duties By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0343 /CH0188 (HB0379) Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Alternate Contributory Pension Selection and Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0344 /CH0189 (HB0380) State Retirement and Pension System - Local Fire and Police System - Commingling of Assets By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0345 /CH0190 (HB0382) State Retirement and Pension System - Optional Retirement Allowances - Designated Beneficiaries By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0373 /CH0196 (HB0537) Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Clarification By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0473 /CH0211 (HB0582) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Clifton T. Perkins Maximum Security Guards - Allowances By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2016 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0477 /CH0212 (HB0581) State Retirement and Pension System - Reemployment of Ordinary Disability Retirees - Earnings Limitation By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2016 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0820 (HB0940) State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Retirement - Alterations By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 8:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2016 - 8:30 AM
SB0821 /CH0233 (HB1397) Participating Governmental Units - Amortization Schedule By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2016 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM