Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Prince George's County Delegation & Montgomery Co Deleg

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0973 /CH0628
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Commission Infractions - Watershed Regulations PG/MC 102-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Upgrade of Facilities PG/MC 108-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0975
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Customer Affordability Program PG/MC 103-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977 /CH0629
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission Park Police - Workers' Compensation - Lyme Disease Presumption - Repeal of Termination Date PG/MC 110-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1075 /CH0639
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Definitions PG/MC 106-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1334
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking PG/MC 112-14
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0973 /CH0628 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Commission Infractions - Watershed Regulations PG/MC 102-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0974 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Upgrade of Facilities PG/MC 108-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0975 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Customer Affordability Program PG/MC 103-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0977 /CH0629 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission Park Police - Workers' Compensation - Lyme Disease Presumption - Repeal of Termination Date PG/MC 110-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Economic Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1075 /CH0639 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Definitions PG/MC 106-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1334 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking PG/MC 112-14 By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM