Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Washington County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0283 (SB0278)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354 (SB0104)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0700 /CH0123 (SB0590/CH0124)
Title
Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0701 /CH0125
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Hours of Sale
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0702 (SB0501)
Title
Washington County - Abandoned Vehicles - Regulation by Local Authority
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0283 (SB0278) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0354 (SB0104) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0700 /CH0123 (SB0590/CH0124) Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0701 /CH0125 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Hours of Sale By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0702 (SB0501) Washington County - Abandoned Vehicles - Regulation by Local Authority By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM