Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018 /CH0604 (SB0016)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145 /CH0215 (SB0244/CH0214)
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 /CH0226 (SB0313/CH0225)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Anne Arundel County Deputy Sheriff
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1305 /CH0675
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirement
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0163 (SB0172)
Title
Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' Court
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 /CH0604 (SB0016) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0145 /CH0215 (SB0244/CH0214) City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container License By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0370 /CH0226 (SB0313/CH0225) Workers' Compensation - Anne Arundel County Deputy Sheriff By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1305 /CH0675 City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirement By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 675
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0163 (SB0172) Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County - Judges Sitting as Orphans' Court By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM