Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Anne Arundel County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 (HB0299)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Areas in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0714 (HB1218)
Title
Possession of Medical Cannabis in Local Correctional Facilities – Prohibition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 (HB0429)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Personal Property - Possession and Release
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1176 /CH0675 (HB1746)
Title
Housing Commission of Anne Arundel County - Terms
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0141 (HB0299) Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Areas in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of Operation By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0714 (HB1218) Possession of Medical Cannabis in Local Correctional Facilities – Prohibition By Request - Committee 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0265 (HB0429) Anne Arundel County - Personal Property - Possession and Release By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB1176 /CH0675 (HB1746) Housing Commission of Anne Arundel County - Terms By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 675
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM